CA AB2587 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3303.1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability compensation: paid family leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2587 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2587 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4643.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code3303.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback