CA AB2587 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7007 to the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Correctional facility construction: local agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 7007 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 836.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |