CA AB2585 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 13008 and 13055 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 4444 to, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 4500) to Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to burning of lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribed burns: burn managers: liability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code13008Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13055Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4444New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback