CA AB2585 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13008 and 13055 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 4444 to, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 4500) to Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to burning of lands.
Title
Prescribed burns: burn managers: liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4444 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2585 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2585 |