CA AB2582 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11041, 11322, 11381, 11384, 11385, and 11386 of, and to add Section 11382 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Recall elections: local offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2582 Bennett Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2582 Bennett et al. By Newman (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2582 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2582 Bennett et al. By Newman (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2582 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 19.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5003.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 15. Page 4653.) |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 27). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11382 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 11384 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |