CA AB2581 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 12839) to Chapter 1 of Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to childhood development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early childhood development: interagency workgroup.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2581 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 7.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-04-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12839New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback