CA AB258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8255 of, and to add Section 8256.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency shelters: Emergency Housing and Assistance Program: pets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2022-01-20AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2021-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
2021-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8255Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8256.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback