CA AB2576 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4062, 4064, and 4126.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 8628.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergencies.
Title
Emergencies: health care.
Sponsors
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2576 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2576 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2576 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2576 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2576 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6906.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5908.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5306.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4062.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4126.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8628.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.723 | New Code | See Bill Text |