CA AB2573 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25600.05 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer: premiums, gifts, and free goods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2573 Low By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2573 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5518.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5594.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25600Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600.05New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback