CA AB2571 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 39 (commencing with Section 22949.80) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to firearms, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Firearms: advertising to minors.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Assembly - AB 2571 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2571 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2571 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2571 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2571 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15.). |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 19.) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4531.). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 4856.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22949.80 | New Code | See Bill Text |