CA AB2570 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 606.6 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.
Title
Unemployment insurance: professional employer
Sponsors
Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2570 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2570 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From Senate committee without further action. | |
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5555.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |