CA AB2567 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to tidelands and submerged lands in the San Joaquin River, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Port of Stockton: tidelands and submerged lands: land grants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback