CA AB2564 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 43024.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil penalties: glider vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2564 RODRIGUEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2564 Rodriguez et al. By Allen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2564 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6373.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5269.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code43024Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43024.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback