CA AB2561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 102365 and 103245 of, to repeal Section 102340 of, and to repeal and add Section 102335 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to local records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital records: local registrar: copy of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2561 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2561 FLORA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code102335New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code102340Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code102365Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103245Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback