CA AB256 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 745 and 1473 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 256 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Kalra et al. By Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 256 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Kalra et al. By Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 256 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 25.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5207.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1720.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 1752.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 745 | Amended Code | Citation Text |