CA AB256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3469 and 3469.2 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife: California Winter Rice Habitat Incentive Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 256 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Date (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Aguiar-Curry By Nielsen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - AB 256 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3533.).
2019-09-12AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 12).
2019-09-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
2019-09-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2700.).
2019-09-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-15SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1041.)
2019-04-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27).
2019-03-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-02-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2019-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code3469Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code3469.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback