CA AB2556 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1368.017 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.1991 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Behavioral health and wellness screenings: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-08 - Assembly - AB 2556 Jackson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2556 Jackson et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2556 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2556 Jackson et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2556 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4627.). |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2024-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5089.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1368.017 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1991 | New Code | See Bill Text |