CA AB2556 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3505.7 of, and to add Section 3503.1 to, the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Local public employee organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2556 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2556 O'Donnell By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2556 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2556 O'Donnell By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2556 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5210.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 4607.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3503.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3505.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |