CA AB2556 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4292 and 4295 of the Public Resources Code, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 8390) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical lines: trimming of trees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4292 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8390 | New Code | See Bill Text |