CA AB2555 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18940.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: water conserving plumbing fixtures.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2555 W., P.& W. Assembly Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4501.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2074.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2074.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2074.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2075.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2115.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18940.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |