CA AB2551 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4795 and 4796 of, to add Article 4.3 (commencing with Section 4497) to Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, and to add Part 4.7 (commencing with Section 71365) to Division 34 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry and fire prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forestry and fire prevention: joint prescribed burning operations: watersheds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2551 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Wood et al. By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2551 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateSenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7015.).
2018-08-29SenateIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5980.).
2018-08-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06AssemblyIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code4495New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4497New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4629.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4665New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4795Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4796Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback