CA AB255 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1952.9 of the Civil Code, relating to COVID-19 relief.
Title
COVID-19 Emergency Small Business Eviction Relief Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 255 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Muratsuchi. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1908.) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Muratsuchi. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 21. Page 1862.). |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1782.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 4). |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1952.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |