CA AB2540 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12283 and 12284 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
State facilities and public buildings: vote centers and polling places.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2540 Mullin By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2540 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2540 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5802.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5514.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 12283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 12284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |