CA AB2532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18170, 18190, 18400, 18405, 18415, 18420, and 18500 of the Penal Code, and Sections 8100, 8102, and 8105 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: gun violence restraining orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2532 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 3.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2020-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code18170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18190Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18400Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18405Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18415Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18420Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18500Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback