CA AB253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69959 to, and to add and repeal Section 69959.5 of, the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Remote court reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 253 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB253 Mark Stone By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 253 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB253 Mark Stone By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 253 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3470.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2700.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and P. & C.P. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69959 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69959.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |