CA AB253 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 987.010 to the Military and Veterans Code, and to amend Sections 5845 and 14684 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 253 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 253 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and T. & H. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1688.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 987.010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14684 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |