CA AB2529 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17035, 17222, 18662, 19002, 19355, 19361, 19709, and 23036 of, and to add Section 18662.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxation: like kind exchanges: withholding.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18662.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2529 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2529 |