CA AB2524 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 418, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 418, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21627 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 12525.2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 13010, 13010.5, 13012, 13012.6, 13013, 13014, 13023, and 13519.4 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal justice.
Title
OpenJustice Data Act of 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2524 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2524 Irwin By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2524 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2524 Irwin By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2524 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 418, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6455.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5342.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5197.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12525.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13519.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |