CA AB2522 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 95014 and 95020 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4512 and 4648 of, and to repeal Sections 4648.5 and 4783 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 95014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 95020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4783 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2522 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2522 |