CA AB2518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 1660) to Division 2 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Voluntary stream restoration landowner liability.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2518 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2518 |