CA AB2517 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Part 4 (commencing with Section 1000) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2517 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5431.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 24).
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1000Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback