CA AB2512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1376 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Death penalty: person with an intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2512 Mark Stone et al. By Bradford (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2512 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2512 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4372.). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 31). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 4851.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4679.) |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1376 | Amended Code | Citation Text |