CA AB251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1154, 1156, 1156.5, 1157.5, 1170.1, 1190, and 1190.1 of, and to add Section 1190.2 to, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bar pilots: pilotage rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 251 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-07-05SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-07SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2017-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback