CA AB251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1154, 1156, 1156.5, 1157.5, 1170.1, 1190, and 1190.1 of, and to add Section 1190.2 to, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilots.
Title
Bar pilots: pilotage rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 251 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 251 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1156.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1157.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1170.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1226.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1275.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |