CA AB2506 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 34011 and 34012 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Cannabis: excise tax: cultivation tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |