CA AB2501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 116681 and 116682 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water: consolidation and extension of service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2501 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5428.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116681Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116682Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback