CA AB2500 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69513.2 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: application deadlines: postponement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2500 Mike Fong By Limón (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2500 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2024-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2024-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2024-08-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2024-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-05SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2024-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2024-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5375.)
2024-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2024-05-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2024-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2024-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2024-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2024-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69513.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback