CA AB25 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25160.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Hazardous waste transportation: consolidated manifest.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Blakeslee [R] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Mike Davis [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Asm. Jeff Miller [R] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] | Asm. Ira Ruskin [D] | Asm. Cameron Smyth [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 25 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence- Urgency Added By NAVA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB25 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Nava) Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 25 GILMORE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB25 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Nava) Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 25 GILMORE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6720.) | |
2010-08-25 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 24). | |
2010-08-23 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6542.) | |
2010-08-20 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4490.) | |
2010-08-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 2). | |
2010-07-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3912.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21). | |
2010-01-14 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14). | |
2010-01-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). | |
2010-01-11 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3746.) | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25160.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |