CA AB2497 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 3588) to Chapter 12 of Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to higher education employment relations.
Title
Higher Education Employer-Employee Relations Act: new employee orientation: membership authorization forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3588 | New Code | See Bill Text |