CA AB2495 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7613, 8609.5, 8713, 8714, 8802, 8803, 8910, 8912, 9000, and 9324 of the Family Code, relating to the parent and child relationship.
Title
The parent and child relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - AB 2495 Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2495 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2495 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2495 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2495 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4575.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4581.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 7613 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8609.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 9000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 9324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |