CA AB2495 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 688.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Prosecuting attorneys: charging defendants for the prosecution costs of criminal violations of local ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2495 MAYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2495 Mayes et al. By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2495 MAYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2495 Mayes et al. By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2495 MAYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 6373.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5289.). |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4643.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 688.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |