CA AB2492 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11550 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2492 Jones-Sawyer By Mitchell (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2492 Jones-Sawyer Lay on Table (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2492 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2492 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading Amend By JONES-SAWYER Set #1 (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2492 Jones-Sawyer Lay on Table (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2492 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2492 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading Amend By JONES-SAWYER Set #1 (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4690.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5332.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 5226.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54956.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |