CA AB2491 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 108983 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Cosmetic products: safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108983 | New Code | See Bill Text |