CA AB2488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.1 (commencing with Section 20118.5) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: task order procurement contracting: Los Angeles Unified School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 O'Donnell By Wilk (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2488 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2488 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 5106.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5428.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20118.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |