CA AB2487 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 301, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 301, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2190.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: continuing education: opiate-dependent patient treatment and management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2487 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2487 McCarty et al. By Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2487 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2487 McCarty et al. By Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2487 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 301, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6507.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5466.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 5640.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5204.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 2). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 10). |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2082 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2190.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2190.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |