CA AB2484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 204.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Private employment: compensating time off: exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 204.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |