CA AB2481 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25163, 25217.2, 25217.2.1, 25218.3, 25218.5, and 25218.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Household hazardous waste: facilities: transportation and acceptance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2481 Smith Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2481 Smith By Dahle (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2481 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2481 Smith By Dahle (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2481 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4902.). |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4581.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25217.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25217.2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |