CA AB2476 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1225 and 1275.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health and care facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health and care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2476 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Cass="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Cass="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1225 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1275.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |