CA AB2471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7150, 7159, and 7159.10 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1689.5, 1689.6, 1689.7, 1689.13, 1689.20, 1689.21, and 1689.24 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 5898.16 and 5898.17 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior citizens: rescission of contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2471 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2020-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27).
2020-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2020-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback