CA AB2469 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5156.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Specialized license plates: breast cancer awareness.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2469 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2469 Frazier Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2469 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2469 Frazier Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2469 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-08-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5813.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4871.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4595.). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5156.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |